Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06667 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 2, 2023
Fiscal Note May 30, 2023
Fiscal Note May 26, 2023
Fiscal Note May 25, 2023
Fiscal Note April 17, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis September 26, 2023
Analysis May 30, 2023
Analysis May 26, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 12, 2023