House | 04/06/2023 | File Number 473 | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | House Calendar Number 299 | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |