House | 06/26/2023 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Special Act 23-13 | ||
House | 06/05/2023 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 498 | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | File Number 403 | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | House Calendar Number 266 | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |