House
|
06/26/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Public Act 23-67
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
File Number 775
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 499
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7311
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
File Number 59
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Calendar Number 63
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/13/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|