Senate | 05/01/2023 | File Number 670 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 404 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7123 | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | File Number 74 | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | House Calendar Number 71 | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |