House | 05/02/2023 | File Number 679 | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | House Calendar Number 452 | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |