House | 04/04/2023 | File Number 406 | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | House Calendar Number 269 | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |