House
|
06/26/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Public Act 23-123
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
File Number 846
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 579
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8995
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
File Number 583
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House Calendar Number 354
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|