House | 03/29/2023 | File Number 313 | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | House Calendar Number 211 | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Public Hearing 03/02 | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |