Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 607
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9690
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
File Number 315
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
House Calendar Number 213
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|