Senate | 05/12/2023 | File Number 774 | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 500 | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7622 | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | File Number 362 | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | House Calendar Number 249 | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 12:00 PM | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |