House | 06/12/2023 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/05/2023 | Public Act 23-32 | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 467 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | File Number 634 | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | House Calendar Number 401 | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 12:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |