House
|
06/27/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Public Act 23-185
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 630
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10090
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
No New File by Committee on Housing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred by House to Committee on Housing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
File Number 537
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
House Calendar Number 332
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|