House | 04/25/2023 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | File Number 407 | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | House Calendar Number 270 | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Public Hearing 03/10 | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |