House | 05/24/2023 | Bill Passed Temporarily | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | House Designated House Amendment Schedule A 8497 | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | File Number 488 | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | House Calendar Number 315 | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 12:00 PM | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |