House | 05/16/2023 | File Number 783 | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | File Number 663 | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | New File by Committee on Education | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Referred by House to Committee on Education | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | File Number 370 | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | House Calendar Number 257 | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 12:00 PM | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |