House
|
06/27/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Public Act 23-156
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
File Number 806
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 539
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8008
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
File Number 335
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
House Calendar Number 234
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|