Connecticut 2023 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06857 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/01/2023

                       
 
LCO No. 5125  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 6857  
January Session, 2023 
LCO No. 5125 
 
 
Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(HS)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT IMPLEMENTING THE RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE FOOD 
AS MEDICINE WORKING GROUP. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective from passage) (a) As used in this section and 1 
section 2 of this act, (1) "certified dietitian-nutritionist" means a dietitian-2 
nutritionist certified pursuant to section 20-206n of the general statutes, 3 
(2) "certain health conditions" means conditions including, but not 4 
limited to, prediabetes, gestational diabetes and types 1 and 2 diabetes, 5 
heart disease, including hypertension, hypercholesterol, dyslipidemia 6 
and congestive heart failure, food allergies, celiac disease, chronic 7 
obstructive pulmonary disease, renal disease and obesity, (3) "health 8 
care provider" means a physician, physician's assistant, advanced 9 
practice registered nurse, certified dietitian-nutritionist or certified 10 
diabetes educator, and (4) "produce prescription" means a prescription 11 
for fruits and vegetables without added salt, sugar or fat given to a 12 
Medicaid enrollee with certain health conditions by a health care 13 
provider. 14 
(b) The Commissioner of Social Services shall apply for a Medicaid 15  Raised Bill No.  6857 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5125   	2 of 4 
 
waiver under Section 1115 of the Social Security Act for a three-year 16 
pilot program to provide Medicaid coverage for produce prescriptions 17 
for a Medicaid enrollee with certain health conditions. The 18 
commissioner may provide such enrollee with vouchers or an electronic 19 
debit card restricted to purchases of prescribed produce. 20 
(c) Not later than January 15, 2024, January 15, 2025, and January 15, 21 
2026, the commissioner shall file reports, in accordance with the 22 
provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, with the joint 23 
standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of 24 
matters relating to human services on (1) the number of Medicaid 25 
enrollees who have received produce prescriptions, (2) data regarding 26 
the effect produce prescriptions have on their health, including, but not 27 
limited to, indicators such as blood sugar levels, blood pressure and 28 
serum lipids, (3) the effect on ranges of food insecurity, as measured by 29 
the United States Department of Agriculture, and (4) the cost to the state 30 
to provide Medicaid reimbursement for such prescriptions compared to 31 
any savings generated by improved health outcomes for such enrollees. 32 
The commissioner shall share aggregate data on food insecurity among 33 
pilot program participants with organizations that track data on food 34 
insecurity and connect food insecure persons with nutritional 35 
assistance. 36 
Sec. 2. (Effective from passage) (a) As used in this section, (1) "medically 37 
tailored meals" means a meal plan consisting of five to twenty-one meals 38 
per week tailored by a certified dietitian-nutritionist, or other qualified 39 
nutrition professional as determined by the Commissioner of Social 40 
Services, to help treat certain health conditions of Medicaid enrollees, 41 
and (2) "medically tailored food" means partially prepared or 42 
nonprepared food items, or both, sufficient to prepare not more than 43 
fourteen meals per week selected by a certified dietitian-nutritionist, or 44 
other qualified nutrition professional as determined by the 45 
commissioner, as part of a treatment plan for a Medicaid enrollee with 46 
certain health conditions. 47 
(b) The Commissioner of Social Services shall convene a working 48  Raised Bill No.  6857 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5125   	3 of 4 
 
group not later than August 1, 2023, to develop recommendations to 49 
improve health outcomes for Medicaid enrollees with certain health 50 
conditions by treating food as medicine. The working group's study 51 
shall include, but not be limited to, best practices for integrating 52 
medically tailored meals and medically tailored food for Medicaid 53 
enrollees with certain health conditions into the state's medical 54 
assistance program. 55 
(c) The working group shall consist of (1) the Commissioner of Social 56 
Services, or the commissioner's designee; (2) the Commissioner of 57 
Agriculture, or the commissioner's designee; (3) a representative of the 58 
elderly nutrition program administered by the Department of Aging 59 
and Disability Services, appointed by the Commissioner of Aging and 60 
Disability Services; (4) a certified dietitian-nutritionist with experience 61 
in planning medically tailored meals or medically tailored foods for 62 
persons with certain health conditions, appointed by the Commissioner 63 
of Social Services; (5) an academic professional, who has researched the 64 
link between nutrition and certain health conditions, appointed by the 65 
Commissioner of Social Services; (6) two Medicaid enrollees with 66 
certain health conditions, appointed by the Commissioner of Social 67 
Services; (7) one person appointed by the House chairperson of the joint 68 
standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of 69 
matters relating to human services; and (8) one person appointed by the 70 
Senate chairperson of the joint standing committee of the General 71 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to human services. 72 
(d) The chairpersons of the working group shall be chosen by 73 
members of the working group. The working group shall meet not less 74 
than monthly and shall provide recommendations to the Commissioner 75 
of Social Services not later than January 1, 2024. The working group shall 76 
terminate on the date that it submits such report or January 1, 2024, 77 
whichever is later. 78 
Sec. 3. Section 17b-28e of the general statutes is amended by adding 79 
subsection (f) as follows (Effective from passage): 80  Raised Bill No.  6857 
 
 
 
LCO No. 5125   	4 of 4 
 
(NEW) (f) Not later than October 1, 2023, the Commissioner of Social 81 
Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to add reimbursement for 82 
medical nutrition therapy provided by a dietitian-nutritionist certified 83 
pursuant to section 20-206n to a Medicaid enrollee with certain health 84 
conditions. For purposes of this subsection, "certain health conditions" 85 
has the same meaning as provided in section 1 of this act and "medical 86 
nutrition therapy" means an evidence-based, individualized nutrition 87 
plan designed to help treat certain health conditions. 88 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage New section 
Sec. 2 from passage New section 
Sec. 3 from passage 17b-28e(f) 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To establish (1) a pilot program to provide Medicaid funding for 
produce prescriptions for Medicaid enrollees with certain health 
conditions, (2) a working group to develop additional 
recommendations, including for providing medically tailored meals for 
such persons, and (3) Medicaid reimbursement for certified dietitian-
nutritionists who provide medical nutrition therapy. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]