Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06857 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/30/2023

                             
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2023HB-06857-R01-
HB.docx  
1 of 4 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 6857  
January Session, 2023 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT IMPLEMENTING THE RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE FOOD 
AS MEDICINE WORKING GROUP.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective from passage) (a) As used in this section 1 
and section 2 of this act, (1) "certified dietitian-nutritionist" means a 2 
dietitian-nutritionist certified pursuant to section 20-206n of the 3 
general statutes, (2) "certain health conditions" means conditions 4 
including, but not limited to, prediabetes, gestational diabetes and 5 
types 1 and 2 diabetes, heart disease, including hypertension, 6 
hypercholesterol, dyslipidemia and congestive heart failure, food 7 
allergies, celiac disease, chronic obstructive pulmonary disease, renal 8 
disease and obesity, (3) "health care provider" means a physician, 9 
physician assistant, advanced practice registered nurse, certified 10 
dietitian-nutritionist or certified diabetes educator, and (4) "produce 11 
prescription" means a prescription for fruits and vegetables without 12 
added salt, sugar or fat given to a Medicaid enrollee with certain 13 
health conditions by a health care provider. 14 
(b) The Commissioner of Social Services shall apply for a Medicaid 15 
waiver under Section 1115 of the Social Security Act for a three-year 16 
pilot program to provide Medicaid coverage for produce prescriptions 17 
for a Medicaid enrollee with certain health conditions. The 18 
commissioner may provide such enrollee with vouchers or an 19  Substitute Bill No. 6857 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2023HB-06857-
R01-HB.docx }   
2 of 4 
 
electronic debit card restricted to purchases of prescribed produce. 20 
(c) Not later than January 15, 2024, January 15, 2025, and January 15, 21 
2026, the commissioner shall file reports, in accordance with the 22 
provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, with the joint 23 
standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of 24 
matters relating to human services on (1) the number of Medicaid 25 
enrollees who have received produce prescriptions, (2) data regarding 26 
the effect produce prescriptions have on their health, including, but 27 
not limited to, indicators such as blood sugar levels, blood pressure 28 
and serum lipids, (3) the effect of produce prescriptions on ranges of 29 
food insecurity, as measured by the United States Department of 30 
Agriculture, and (4) the cost to the state to provide Medicaid 31 
reimbursement for such prescriptions compared to any savings 32 
generated by improved health outcomes for such enrollees. The 33 
commissioner shall share aggregate data on food insecurity among 34 
pilot program participants with organizations that track data on food 35 
insecurity and connect food insecure persons with nutritional 36 
assistance. 37 
Sec. 2. (Effective from passage) (a) As used in this section, (1) 38 
"medically tailored meals" means a meal plan consisting of five to 39 
twenty-one meals per week tailored by a certified dietitian-nutritionist, 40 
or other qualified nutrition professional as determined by the 41 
Commissioner of Social Services, to help treat certain health conditions 42 
of Medicaid enrollees, and (2) "medically tailored food" means 43 
partially prepared or nonprepared food items, or both, sufficient to 44 
prepare not more than fourteen meals per week selected by a certified 45 
dietitian-nutritionist, or other qualified nutrition professional as 46 
determined by the commissioner, as part of a treatment plan for a 47 
Medicaid enrollee with certain health conditions. 48 
(b) The Commissioner of Social Services shall convene a working 49 
group not later than August 1, 2023, to develop recommendations to 50 
improve health outcomes for Medicaid enrollees with certain health 51 
conditions by treating food as medicine. The working group's study 52  Substitute Bill No. 6857 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2023HB-06857-
R01-HB.docx }   
3 of 4 
 
shall include, but not be limited to, best practices for integrating 53 
medically tailored meals and medically tailored food for Medicaid 54 
enrollees with certain health conditions into the state's medical 55 
assistance program. 56 
(c) The working group shall consist of (1) the Commissioner of 57 
Social Services, or the commissioner's designee; (2) the Commissioner 58 
of Agriculture, or the commissioner's designee; (3) a representative of 59 
the elderly nutrition program administered by the Department of 60 
Aging and Disability Services, appointed by the Commissioner of 61 
Aging and Disability Services; (4) a certified dietitian-nutritionist with 62 
experience in planning medically tailored meals or medically tailored 63 
foods for persons with certain health conditions, appointed by the 64 
Commissioner of Social Services; (5) an academic professional, who 65 
has researched the link between nutrition and certain health 66 
conditions, appointed by the Commissioner of Social Services; (6) two 67 
Medicaid enrollees with certain health conditions, appointed by the 68 
Commissioner of Social Services; (7) one person appointed by the 69 
House chairperson of the joint standing committee of the General 70 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to human services; 71 
and (8) one person appointed by the Senate chairperson of the joint 72 
standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of 73 
matters relating to human services. 74 
(d) The chairpersons of the working group shall be chosen by 75 
members of the working group. The working group shall meet not less 76 
than monthly and shall provide a report with recommendations to the 77 
Commissioner of Social Services not later than January 1, 2024. The 78 
working group shall terminate on the date that it submits such report 79 
or January 1, 2024, whichever is later. 80 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage New section 
Sec. 2 from passage New section  Substitute Bill No. 6857 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2023HB-06857-
R01-HB.docx }   
4 of 4 
 
 
HS Joint Favorable Subst. C/R 	APP