House | 04/17/2023 | File Number 621 | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | House Calendar Number 404 | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 12:00 PM | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Public Hearing 03/10 | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |