Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06893 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 8, 2023
Fiscal Note June 7, 2023
Fiscal Note April 11, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis August 10, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 21, 2023