House
|
06/28/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Public Act 23-203
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10199
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 626
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10173
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
File Number 655
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House Calendar Number 423
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Public Hearing 03/22
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|