House
|
06/26/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Public Act 23-90
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
File Number 830
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 554
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8034
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
File Number 743
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Calendar Number 501
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/23 12:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Public Hearing 03/28
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|