House | 04/25/2023 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | File Number 549 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | House Calendar Number 344 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Public Hearing 03/22 | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |