Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Public Act 23-167
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 10002
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
House Calendar Number 620
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 9264
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 9369
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 9368
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 9327
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9226
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
File Number 551
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 323
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|