Senate | 05/08/2023 | File Number 735 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 472 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/23 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Vote to Draft |