House | 05/19/2023 | House Calendar Number 549 | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7481 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | File Number 218 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 147 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/23 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Public Hearing 02/01 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |