Senate | 05/04/2023 | File Number 697 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 423 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/03/23 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |