Senate | 03/20/2023 | File Number 120 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 100 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/23 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |