Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Public Act 23-186
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10134
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House Calendar Number 604
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8773
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
File Number 554
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 326
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Public Hearing 02/16
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|