Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01009 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 2, 2023
Fiscal Note May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note March 9, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023