Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Public Act 23-96
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
House Calendar Number 625
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
File Number 673
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 403
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|