Senate | 06/26/2023 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/20/2023 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/20/2023 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Public Act 23-111 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | House Passed | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | House Calendar Number 629 | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | File Number 430 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 243 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |