Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01067 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 25, 2023
Fiscal Note May 22, 2023
Fiscal Note May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note April 6, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 6, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023