LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB01069
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB01069
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2023 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB01069
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note
May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note
April 18, 2023
Fiscal Note
April 13, 2023
Bill
February 16, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
September 18, 2023
Analysis
May 17, 2023
Bill
May 3, 2023
Compare
Analysis
April 13, 2023
Bill
April 13, 2023
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
June 5, 2023
Compare