Senate | 05/30/2023 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Public Act 23-3 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | House Calendar Number 445 | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | File Number 200 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 142 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/23 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Public Hearing 03/02 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |