Senate | 05/02/2023 | File Number 677 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 406 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/23 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |