Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Public Act 23-197
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Calendar Number 561
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8125
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
File Number 498
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 282
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 12:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|