Senate | 04/03/2023 | File Number 392 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 228 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |