Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01165 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note May 3, 2023
Fiscal Note March 28, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis September 1, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023
Bill March 28, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 5, 2023