Senate | 04/05/2023 | File Number 448 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 261 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/23 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |