House | 05/19/2023 | House Calendar Number 562 | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7821 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | File Number 506 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 284 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |