House | 05/10/2023 | House Calendar Number 515 | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 7519 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | File Number 568 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 340 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/23 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |