Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01221 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 6, 2023
Fiscal Note June 5, 2023
Fiscal Note June 2, 2023
Fiscal Note April 12, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis August 10, 2023
Analysis June 3, 2023
Bill May 23, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 27, 2023