Senate | 04/17/2023 | File Number 620 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 367 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |