House
|
06/04/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Public Act 24-91
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Calendar Number 445
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5504
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
File Number 594
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
House Calendar Number 407
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/24 12:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Public Hearing 03/28
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|