House
|
05/22/2024
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Public Act 24-76
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2024
|
Signed by Governor in Original
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
File Number 646
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Senate Calendar Number 414
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4912
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
File Number 199
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Calendar Number 152
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 12:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|