House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Public Act 24-86
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
File Number 618
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Senate Calendar Number 374
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3792
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
File Number 33
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
House Calendar Number 54
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/13/24 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Public Hearing 02/20
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
|
|
|