House | 03/13/2024 | File Number 23 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | House Calendar Number 47 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/24 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |