Connecticut 2024 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05160 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/13/2024

                     
Researcher: JC 	Page 1 	3/13/24 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 5160  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE MAINTENANCE OF LIABILITY 
INSURANCE COVERAGE BY CHILD CARE CENTERS, GROUP 
CHILD CARE HOMES AND FAMILY CHILD CARE HOMES.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Office of Early Childhood (OEC) commissioner, 
by December 1, 2024, to consult with a nonprofit organization that 
provides entrepreneurial and financial education services to women 
and develop a document that explains the (1) benefits of child care 
centers and homes maintaining liability insurance coverage and (2) 
potential consequences of not having this coverage. The OEC 
commissioner must electronically distribute the document to licensed 
child care centers, group child care homes, and family child care homes 
each year, starting by January 1, 2025.  
    Starting by the January 1, 2025, the bill requires these centers and 
homes, when making or renewing child care services agreements, to 
give the person seeking services a written notice indicating whether or 
not the licensee carries at least $100,000 of liability insurance coverage 
for damages resulting from bodily injury or death to someone. The 
notice may state that the coverage is not required by law. Additionally, 
starting by January 1, 2026, each licensee must annually confirm 
compliance with the bill’s notice requirement to the OEC commissioner 
as she prescribes. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Committee on Children 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 11 Nay 6 (02/29/2024)